U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Brown v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 21, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • May 15, 2018: [Response (generic)]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Response (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order]
  • January 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 18, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • October 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 30, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 30, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 09, 2017: [Receipt]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 03, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.