U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Morales v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 13, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2017: [Affidavit]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • October 09, 2017: [Affidavit]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Consent Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 22, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 22, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 22, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order]
  • April 03, 2017: [Summons Issued]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 08, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 06, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.