U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Duncan v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [USCA Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [USCA Order]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Errata]
  • August 30, 2019: [Supplement]
  • August 16, 2019: [Supplement]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Supplement]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Supplement]
  • January 22, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 30, 2017: [Appendix]
  • October 30, 2017: [Seal Document]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 20, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 19, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 23, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • March 06, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • March 06, 2017: [Errata]
  • March 06, 2017: [Seal]
  • March 06, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 06, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.