U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00529
  • Case Name: Longee v. Svancara
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 16, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2018: [Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 04, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • September 26, 2017: [Produce]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 05, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.