U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Weaver v. Kefoot et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Receipt]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Letter]
  • October 11, 2017: [Request for Waiver of Service]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 29, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 29, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 17, 2017: [Supplement]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 06, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 06, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 06, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.