U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Rendon v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 10, 2017: [Receipt]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 06, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.