U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Abdullah v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 16, 2022: [Seal]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Stay]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • September 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 11, 2017: [Response (generic)]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Status Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Status Report]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2017: [Stay]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 07, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.