U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Power Constructors, Inc. v. U.S. Department of Labor
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Summons Reissued]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 14, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2017: [Summons Reissued]
  • March 10, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 08, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 07, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 07, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 07, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.