U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Westlund v. Encompass Home Health of the West, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 02, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 19, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 14, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.