U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Goodrick v. Zmuda et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Reconsideration]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order]
  • June 28, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 26, 2018: [Request]
  • June 15, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 15, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 21, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • November 08, 2017: [Request]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Request]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 08, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.