U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Hoagland v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • July 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • May 17, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • January 03, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 08, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 08, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 08, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.