U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00105
  • Case Name: Rainbow's End Recovery Center, LLC et al v. Maple et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Enforce Judgment]
  • December 13, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • December 13, 2017: [Entry of Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 23, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • March 21, 2017: [Remand]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • March 16, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 14, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 14, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • March 14, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order]
  • March 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2017: [Remand]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 13, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 13, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.