U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Ellis v. Atencio et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 29, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 15, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 10, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 09, 2017: [Receipt]
  • March 09, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.