U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00326
  • Case Name: Piland v. Kempf
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [USCA Order]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.