U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Ullrich v. Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 25, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • January 25, 2018: [Compel]
  • January 25, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 25, 2018: [Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 29, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2017: [Expedite]
  • March 29, 2017: [Discovery]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 13, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 13, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 13, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.