U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Vanzant v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [USCA Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 22, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 10, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Letter]
  • August 22, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 22, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Receipt]
  • April 18, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 13, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 13, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.