U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Swope et al v. Oneida School District, No. 351
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Sealed Document]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • July 02, 2019: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • June 21, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • June 14, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • June 13, 2019: [Sealed Document]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • May 31, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 24, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 23, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 20, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • May 20, 2019: [Bill of Costs]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • May 15, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 10, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • May 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 10, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • May 08, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 08, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • May 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 07, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 07, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • May 07, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • May 03, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 03, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • May 02, 2019: [Sanctions]
  • May 02, 2019: [Supplement]
  • May 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • May 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 30, 2019: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • April 30, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • April 29, 2019: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • April 29, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 29, 2019: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [~Util - Sealed Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 23, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 19, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • April 19, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 12, 2019: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2019: [Objection]
  • April 08, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 02, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Seal]
  • April 02, 2019: [Objection]
  • April 01, 2019: [In Limine]
  • April 01, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • April 01, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 01, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Errata]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2019: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2019: [Sealed Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Sealed Document]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Status Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Sealed Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Errata]
  • August 30, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 30, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 30, 2018: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 29, 2018: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2018: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 17, 2018: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2018: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [~Util - Sealed Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • July 27, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 26, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 25, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 25, 2018: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • July 04, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2018: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 30, 2018: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2018: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 16, 2018: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 16, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 15, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2018: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 19, 2018: [Sealed Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 22, 2018: [Seal]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order]
  • October 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 21, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2017: [Vacate]
  • September 01, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Declaration]
  • July 17, 2017: [Affidavit]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 13, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 05, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 24, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • May 23, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 03, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.