U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Wright v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • June 06, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • June 06, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 29, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.