U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Wright v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Errata]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 28, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2017: [Expedite]
  • March 14, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.