U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Martin v. McDonald
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Receipt]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Supplement]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 14, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 14, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.