U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Hall v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • December 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2017
  • November 24, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • November 21, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • November 15, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 14, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 14, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • March 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.