U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Quiring v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • December 07, 2017: [Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Response (generic)]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • March 14, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.