U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00118
  • Case Name: Wallace v. Beaunoin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Receipt]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • April 26, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 14, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 14, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.