U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Mecham et al v. Jepsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Status Conference]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 21, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 15, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 15, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • July 19, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 17, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 10, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 10, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 07, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 06, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 21, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 19, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 19, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 14, 2017: [Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2017: [Summons Issued]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 21, 2017: [Errata]
  • March 20, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 15, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 14, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 14, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.