U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00119
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Squire et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Entry of Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • January 06, 2020: [Take Deposition]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Status Report]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 30, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [Status Report]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Status Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Status Report]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Status Report]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • August 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 30, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Litigation Order]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 23, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 15, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order]
  • April 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 15, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.