U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Pinnacle Great Plains Operating Company, LLC v. Swenson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 04, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Staying Case]
  • October 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 03, 2017: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 14, 2017: [Consolidate Cases]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 03, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 03, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 03, 2017: [Declaration]
  • May 02, 2017: [Consent Filed]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Litigation Order]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 16, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.