U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Garriott et al v. Western Medical Associates, PLLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 16, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • October 25, 2017: [Witness List]
  • October 24, 2017: [Declaration]
  • October 23, 2017: [Objection]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 17, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2017: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • October 16, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 16, 2017: [Trial Brief]
  • October 16, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 16, 2017: [Witness List]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2017: [Transcript]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 05, 2017: [In Limine]
  • September 01, 2017: [In Limine]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2017: [Joint Mediation Statement]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 24, 2017: [Transcript Request]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • July 13, 2017: [Declaration]
  • July 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 31, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.