U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00123
  • Case Name: Lockman v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Response (generic)]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 07, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • August 07, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 17, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 20, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 20, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 17, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.