U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Sericati et al v. Ada County Highway District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 20, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 09, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 09, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2017: [Strike]
  • April 10, 2017: [Litigation Order]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 21, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • March 20, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 20, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.