U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Dunlap v. O'Connor
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [USCA Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 15, 2017: [Service]
  • June 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 27, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 21, 2017: [Hearing]
  • April 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 03, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2017: [Consent Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.