U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00126
  • Case Name: Navarrette v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 17, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 19, 2017: [Receipt]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 21, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.