U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Miller v. LendingTree, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Protective Order]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Errata]
  • June 16, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • May 15, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 03, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 01, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 28, 2017: [Counterclaim]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • March 22, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.