U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00127
  • Case Name: Thornton v. Carrington Mortgage Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 25, 2018: [Release of Funds]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2018: [Release of Funds]
  • April 12, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 17, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • November 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 03, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • November 03, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 03, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 28, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • September 21, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 21, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 20, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 19, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 14, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • June 26, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 26, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 13, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 16, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 16, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • May 08, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 13, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 13, 2017: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2017: [Appear]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 11, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 10, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order]
  • April 03, 2017: [1-Exparte Document-to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
  • April 03, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.