U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Edwards v. Mills et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 29, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 24, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 24, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 22, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • March 22, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.