U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00131
  • Case Name: Rader v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • August 27, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • November 02, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 09, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 09, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • August 09, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 05, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • May 12, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 23, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 22, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.