U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Draheim v. St. Luke's Regional Medical Center, Ltd
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 07, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Stipulation]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • May 16, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 16, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Litigation Order]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 27, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.