U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00132
  • Case Name: Avritt v. City of Blackfoot et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 13, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order]
  • July 28, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 21, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 21, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 19, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order]
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 18, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 18, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 17, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 26, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 05, 2017: [Litigation Order]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 22, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.