U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Kopplin et al v. Marler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 29, 2017: [Vacate]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Status Report]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 23, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.