U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00134
  • Case Name: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America et al v. Dome Technology, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Response (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 05, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Status Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 24, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.