U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00135
  • Case Name: Benney v. Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Protective Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 31, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 30, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 19, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 19, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.