U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Hernandez v. Nicodemus et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Request]
  • October 05, 2017: [Return Mail]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2017: [Letter]
  • September 05, 2017: [Reconsideration]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Return Mail]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • May 11, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.