U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00137
  • Case Name: Crawford et al v. Bonner County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 29, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 19, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 16, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • June 13, 2017: [Consent Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 16, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Litigation Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 30, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 29, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.