U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00138
  • Case Name: Weathertight Roofing, Inc. v. Paradigm Group, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 06, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 10, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 03, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 22, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 12, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 06, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 12, 2017: [Status Report]
  • June 08, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 30, 2017: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • March 30, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • March 29, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.