U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Prince v. Oregon Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 31, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 14, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 10, 2018: [Errata]
  • January 10, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • December 07, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 07, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order]
  • June 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 25, 2017: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 10, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 08, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 05, 2017: [Litigation Order]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 10, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 10, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 30, 2017: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.