U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00141
  • Case Name: Seaberg et al v. Lloyd
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 16, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 07, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order]
  • November 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 15, 2017: [Errata]
  • September 12, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 08, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 22, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 25, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order]
  • April 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2017: [Summons Issued]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.