U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00140
  • Case Name: Martin et al v. U.S. Government et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Letter of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 31, 2017: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.