U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00144
  • Case Name: Bryson v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 02, 2019: [Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Appellants Reply Brief]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Appellants Brief]
  • August 07, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • July 27, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • July 17, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • May 11, 2017: [Receipt]
  • May 02, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 05, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 04, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 04, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • April 03, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 03, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 03, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.