U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00146
  • Case Name: Savage v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 12, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 15, 2017: [Receipt]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 11, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 11, 2017: [Protective Order]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 04, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 04, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.