U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Knight v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • August 14, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 05, 2017: [Complaint]
  • April 05, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 05, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.