U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Crofts v. Corizon
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 07, 2017: [Complaint]
  • April 07, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • April 07, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 07, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.